US HB375 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian Tribes, and for other purposes. This bill applies the Indian Reorganization Act to all federally recognized Indian tribes, regardless of when a tribe became recognized. The amendments made by this bill are retroactively effective as if included in the Indian Reorganization Act. This effectively overrules the Supreme Court's decision in Carcieri v. Salazar, which held that the Department of the Interior could not take land into trust for a specified tribe because that tribe had not been under federal jurisdiction when the Indian Reorganization Act was enacted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian Tribes, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 208 (Y: 323 N: 96 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2019-05-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 323 - 96 (Roll no. 208). (text: CR H3813)
2019-05-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3824-3825)
2019-05-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-05-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 375.
2019-05-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3813-3816)
2019-05-15HouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 7.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
2019-04-03HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback