US HB3874 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contains provisions related to (1) the protection of lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and intersex (LGBTI) individuals globally; and (2) immigration protections for vulnerable individuals. The bill establishes (1) an interagency group to respond to urgent threats to LGBTI people in foreign countries, and (2) a permanent Special Envoy for the Human Rights of LGBTI Peoples in the Department of State. The President shall impose visa-blocking sanctions on foreign persons responsible for violating the human rights of individuals due to actual or perceived sexual orientation, gender identity, or sex characteristics. The State Department shall establish the Global Equality Fund to provide assistance to nongovernmental organizations working to advance and protect human rights. The U.S. Agency for International Development shall establish the LGBTI Global Development Partnership to work with the private sector and nongovernmental organizations to support LGBTI rights. The bill removes prohibitions against providing foreign assistance to nongovernmental organizations that offer certain medical services using non-U.S. government funds. The bill contains several immigration-related provisions, such as those (1) establishing that persecution based on sexual orientation or gender identity may form the basis of an asylum request, (2) removing the general requirement that an asylum claim must be filed within one year of the applicant's arrival in the United States, (3) establishing that a permanent partnership between two partners is a marriage for immigration law purposes, and (4) establishing that indigent aliens have a right to free counsel in certain immigration proceedings.
Title
GLOBE Act of 2019 Greater Leadership Overseas for the Benefit of Equality Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3252 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3004 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3004 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
HIV/AIDS
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Visas and passports
World health
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
HIV/AIDS
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Visas and passports
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3874/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3874/BILLS-116hr3874ih.pdf |