US HB3976 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing Exports Through Entrepreneurship Act of 2012 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide a small business export expansion credit of 25% of export expansion expenses. Amends the Small Business Act to direct the Office of International Trade (Office) to compile and update annually, for small businesses and their partner entities, a document that contains: (1) the tariff schedules of all foreign countries; and (2) for each of the 50 foreign countries to which the highest total value of U.S. goods and services are exported, specified information on the demand for goods and services in that country. Requires the Office to identify and advertise programs and services to small businesses, including federal programs and services, that facilitate the matching of foreign customers to small businesses. Amends the Export-Import Bank Act of 1945 to increase, from 20% to 30% of the aggregate annual loan authority available to the Export-Import Bank, the amount to be used to finance small business exports. Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to increase the proportion and percentage of projects and assistance financed for small businesses by the Overseas Private Investment Corporation. Provides limitations on duties under the Harmonized Tariff Schedule that apply to certain goods and services imported into the United States for use by small businesses in their regular operations.
Title
Enhancing Exports Through Entrepreneurship Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade. |
2012-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on International Monetary Policy and Trade. |
2012-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to House Small Business |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Income tax credits
Small business
Tariffs
U.S. and foreign investments
Commerce
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Income tax credits
Small business
Tariffs
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3976/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3976/BILLS-112hr3976ih.pdf |