US HB3988 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for congressional approval of national emergency declarations.
Title
ARTICLE ONE Act Assuring that Robust, Thorough, and Informed Congressional Leadership is Exercised Over National Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Kevin Kiley [R-CA] |
Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1912 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB4928 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB4928 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3988/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3988/BILLS-118hr3988ih.pdf |