US HB4007 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Harriet Tubman National Historical Parks Act - Establishes in Caroline, Dorchester, and Talbot Counties, Maryland, the Harriet Tubman Underground Railroad National Historical Park as a unit of the National Park System. Establishes in Auburn, New York, the Harriet Tubman National Historical Park also as a unit of the National Park System. Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to enter into cooperative agreements with certain entities for the historic preservation, restoration, interpretation, and maintenance of such historical parks. Requires the Secretary to complete a general management plan for them.
Title
Harriet Tubman National Historical Parks Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Rep. Ann Buerkle [R-NY] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2012-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB247 (Related) 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
SB247 (Related) 2012-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
SB247 (Related) 2012-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Maryland
New York State
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Maryland
New York State
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4007/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4007/BILLS-112hr4007ih.pdf |