US HB4084 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes financial sanctions and restrictions related to North Korea. The Department of the Treasury shall restrict correspondent and payable-through accounts that are used to facilitate significant transactions or provide services to sanctioned entities, specifically North Korean financial institutions, companies, and certain North Korean individuals, such as those named in certain executive orders. (Correspondent and payable-through accounts are often maintained by foreign financial institutions in U.S. banks to access the U.S. financial system.) Treasury shall use its vote and voice in international financial institutions, such as the International Monetary Fund (IMF), to oppose the provision of assistance by such institutions to governments that fail to enforce the sanctions provided under this bill. The Export-Import Bank may not guarantee, insure, or extend credit in relation to exports to entities sanctioned under this bill. Treasury shall support increasing use of the IMF administrative budget for technical assistance to help IMF members fight money laundering and funding for terrorism. Various sanctions and restrictions under this bill shall be suspended if the President certifies to Congress that (1) North Korea has committed to suspending its weapons of mass destruction programs and engaging in multilateral talks on limiting such programs, or (2) it is in U.S. national security interests to do so.
Title
Otto Warmbier North Korea Nuclear Sanctions Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB4367 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB4367 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Civil actions and liability
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Sanctions
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Civil actions and liability
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Sanctions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4084/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4084/BILLS-116hr4084ih.pdf |