US HB4084 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Treasury to levy a fee on methane emissions from oil and natural gas facilities, and for other purposes.
Title
Methane Emissions Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB645 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4084/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4084/BILLS-117hr4084ih.pdf |