US HB4297 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the John D. Dingell, Jr. Conservation, Management, and Recreation Act to allow for additional entities to be eligible to complete the maintenance work on Bolts Ditch and the Bolts Ditch Headgate within the Holy Cross Wilderness, Colorado.
Title
Bolts Ditch Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2156 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5695 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5695 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4297/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4297/BILLS-118hr4297ih.pdf |