US HB4299 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Quality Housing for Veterans Act - Extends through 2014 the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide specially adapted housing assistance to certain disabled veterans residing temporarily in housing owned by a family member.
Title
Quality Housing for Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1671 (Related) 2011-05-05 - Provisions of measure incorporated into HR 1407.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4299/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4299/BILLS-112hr4299ih.pdf |