US HB433 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Natomas Basin Flood Protection Improvements Act of 2011 - Modifies the project for flood damage reduction, American and Sacramento Rivers, California, to authorize the Secretary of the Army to construct improvements to flood damage reduction facilities adjacent to those rivers in the vicinity of Sacramento, substantially in accordance with the report of the Chief of Engineers entitled "American River Watershed (Common Features) Project, Natomas Basin, Sacramento and Sutter Counties, California," dated December 30, 2010, at a specified cost.Requires the nonfederal interest to receive credit for expenses and in-kind contributions incurred for planning, design, and construction of the project and acquisition of lands, easements, rights-of-way, relocations, and dredged material disposal areas for the project. Requires such credit to be applied toward the nonfederal share of the project or of any other project for which the nonfederal interest has entered into a cost-sharing agreement with the Secretary.
Title
Natomas Basin Flood Protection Improvements Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1810 (Related) 2011-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7157)
Subjects
California
Floods and storm protection
Lakes and rivers
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Floods and storm protection
Lakes and rivers
Water resources development
Water resources funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/433/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr433/BILLS-112hr433ih.pdf |