US HB4330 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Business Risk Planning Act - Amends the Commodity Exchange Act to direct the Commodity Futures Trading Commission (CFTC) to: (1) prescribe a rule for public reporting of swap transactions (including price and volume data) in illiquid markets that are not cleared and entered into by a non-financial entity that is hedging or mitigating commercial risk, and (2) ensure that such swap transaction information is publicly available no sooner than 30 days after it has been executed or at a later date the CFTC determines appropriate to protect the identity of participants and positions in illiquid markets and to prevent the elimination or reduction of market liquidity. Defines an "illiquid market" as one in which there is relatively little volume and infrequent trading in swaps.
Title
Business Risk Planning Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D-TX] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2330 (Related) 2014-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2955-2957)
HB4413 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB4413 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4330/BILLS-113hr4330ih.pdf |