US HB4343 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unlawful Gun Buyer Alert Act This bill amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to require the national instant criminal background check system to notify certain law enforcement agencies when a firearm is transferred to a person who is subsequently determined to be prohibited from receiving or possessing a firearm.
Title
Unlawful Gun Buyer Alert Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB38 (Related) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4477 (Related) 2017-12-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 322.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4477 (Related) 2017-12-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 322.
HB6545 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4343/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4343/BILLS-115hr4343ih.pdf |