US HB4404 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate segments of the Kissimmee River in the State of Florida as a component of the Wild and Scenic Rivers System, and for other purposes.
Title
Kissimmee River Wild and Scenic River Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 377 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-07-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 45 (Roll no. 376). (text: 7/18/2022 CR H6693) |
2022-07-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6866) |
2022-07-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4404. |
2022-07-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6693-6694) |
2022-07-18 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 321. |
2022-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-414. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-11-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |