US HB4424 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to study and report on the prevalence of cholangiocarcinoma in veterans who served in the Vietnam theater of operations during the Vietnam era, and for other purposes.
Title
Vietnam Veterans Liver Fluke Cancer Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Christopher Deluzio [D-PA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-08-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2023-06-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-06-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4424/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4424/BILLS-118hr4424ih.pdf |