US HB4432 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Space Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Space Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial UAS Modernization Act This bill amends the FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012 to permit an individual to operate a small commercial unmanned aircraft without an airworthiness certificate within the United States until the effective date of a final rule based on the notice of proposed rulemaking "Operation and Certification of Small Unmanned Aircraft Systems" issued on February 23, 2015, subject to the following requirements: the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) must receive an attestation that the aircraft owner has liability insurance covering its operation; the owner must register the aircraft; the operator must pass an initial aeronautical knowledge test developed by the FAA and a proficiency test administered by a test site for such aircraft; the aircraft may be operated for commercial purposes only in daylight conditions, under visual line of sight rules, lower than 500 feet above ground level, and only after a preflight inspection; and the aircraft shall yield right of way to all other users of the National Airspace System. Such an aircraft may not be operated: (1) until the operator of a test site certifies that it meets the requirements in the rulemaking notice and can operate within such restrictions; (2) unless the operator has prior authorization from the air traffic control facility having jurisdiction over the Class B, Class C, or Class D airspace or within the lateral boundaries of the surface area of Class E airspace designated for an airport; and (3) by any individual with any physical or mental condition that would interfere with safe operation of the aircraft. The operator of a such an aircraft involved in an accident causing personal injury or property damage must report it to the FAA within two days. The FAA shall provide for a micro UAS classification of unmanned aircraft systems, the aircraft component of which may not weigh more than 4.4 pounds, including payload. The operation of such a micro shall be subject to specified restrictions. The bill directs the FAA to: appoint a Deputy Associate Administrator for Unmanned Aircraft who shall create a research and development plan for the safe integration of unmanned aircraft into the National Airspace System; establish a joint aircraft system research and development data collection and analysis program at the William J. Hughes Technical Center; and implement an air traffic management pilot program to research and test a new regulatory structure for operations of such aircraft in airspace below 1,200 feet.
Title
Commercial UAS Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Space. |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-02-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E98) |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1314 (Related) 2016-03-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Research and development
Technology assessment
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Research and development
Technology assessment
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4432/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4432/BILLS-114hr4432ih.pdf |