US HB453 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Takes specified lands and easements in Monroe County, Tennessee, into trust for the use and benefit of the Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians. These lands include the Sequoyah Museum, the Chota Memorial, the Tanasi Memorial, and land to provide support for these properties and cultural programs. The Tennessee Valley Authority (TVA) maintains its right to carry out river control and development on these lands, including temporarily and intermittently flooding certain lands. The bill specifies the structures that may be constructed with the TVA's consent on certain lands subject to flooding. Additionally, the TVA must be compensated for lost hydropower capacity from future development of these lands. The bill prohibits the United States from being liable for loss or damage resulting from certain activities, such as the flooding of certain lands. The bill outlines TVA's continuing responsibilities, including those related to environmental remediation. Gaming on these lands is prohibited.
Title
Eastern Band of Cherokee Historic Lands Reacquisition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10302-10303) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 453. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10302-10304) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Electric power generation and transmission
Floods and storm protection
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Native Americans
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Tennessee
Water storage
Water use and supply
Electric power generation and transmission
Floods and storm protection
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Native Americans
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Tennessee
Water storage
Water use and supply