US HB4584 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a categorical exclusion for certain forest management activities relating to early successional forests and a categorical exclusion for certain activities relating to outdoor recreation, and for other purposes.
Title
Healthy Forests for Hunters Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] |
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4516 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4518 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB4573 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4623 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4614 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4518 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB4573 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4623 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4614 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4584/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4584/BILLS-117hr4584ih.pdf |