US HB4742 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes an excise tax on "taxable nicotine" which is any nicotine that has been extracted, concentrated, or synthesized and is treated as a tobacco product. The tax does not apply to nicotine used in a product that has been approved by the Food and Drug Administration for sale as a nicotine replacement therapy.
Title
Protecting American Lungs Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 322. |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-400. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 15. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2339 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation