US HB4807 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Defense (DOD) to issue a service medal to members of the Armed Forces who served during the Cold War. The medal may be awarded to service members who (1) served on active duty for at least 24 consecutive months during the Cold War, from September 2, 1945, to December 26, 1991; (2) were deployed outside the continental United States for at least 30 days during the Cold War; (3) were members of a reserve component of the Armed Forces and were called or ordered to active duty to participate in exercises or operations directly related to the Cold War; or (4) performed such other service in the Armed Forces during the Cold War as DOD may prescribe.
Title
Cold War Service Medal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
U.S. history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
U.S. history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4807/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4807/BILLS-116hr4807ih.pdf |