US HB4866 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to establish a program to improve fire weather and fire environment forecasting, detection, and local collaboration, and for other purposes.
Title
Fire Weather Development Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174. |
2023-09-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 118-214. |
2023-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 2. |
2023-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2023-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB369 (Related) 2023-09-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 142.