US HB504 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-116. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-116. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop and update at least once every five years a strategy for DHS engagement with fusion centers. The term "fusion center" means a collaborative effort of two or more government agencies that combines resources, expertise, or information to maximize the ability of such agencies to detect, prevent, investigate, apprehend, and respond to criminal or terrorist activity. The Office of Intelligence and Analysis of DHS shall provide personnel and support to fusion centers, publish performance metrics for DHS field personnel assigned to fusion centers, and develop and implement training for fusion center personnel. DHS intelligence and information components shall develop policies and metrics to ensure effective use of the unclassified Homeland Security Information Sharing Network and shall assess and implement enhancements to improve such network.
Title
DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-116. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-02-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-02-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-10 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H988-989) |
2020-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 504. |
2020-02-10 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved that the House suspend the rules agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H988-990) |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5115) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 47. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-16. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-01-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1261-1262) |
2019-01-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 504. |
2019-01-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1261-1263) |
2019-01-29 | House | Miss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Performance measurement
Terrorism
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Performance measurement
Terrorism