US HB5098 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Works and Economic Development Act of 1965 to authorize the Secretary of Commerce to make predevelopment grants, and for other purposes.
Title
Economic Empowerment Through Predevelopment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-08-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-08-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5517 (Related) 2023-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB2572 (Same As) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3761)
SB2572 (Same As) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3761)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5098/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5098/BILLS-118hr5098ih.pdf |