US HB5140 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently reauthorizes a provision that allows satellite television providers to retransmit distant television signals to unserved households under a statutory license. (A statutory license allows a satellite provider to rebroadcast the signals by paying set fees and without negotiating with the relevant copyright holders.) The bill also limits what constitutes an unserved household under this provision. Under the bill, an unserved household is (1) a household in a local market where any of the four most widely viewed television networks nationwide is not transmitted by any network television station in that market, or (2) a recreational vehicle or commercial truck. The bill removes several categories of households that currently qualify as unserved, such as households that can receive a local broadcast signal but received satellite retransmissions on certain dates. To take advantage of the statutory license, a satellite provider generally must provide retransmissions of local television stations in all designated market areas (DMAs). However, a provider that does not provide such retransmissions of local stations to all DMAs may obtain a temporary statutory license by (1) demonstrating that the provider has made reasonable and good faith efforts to do so, and (2) filing a notice with the Copyright Office.
Title
Satellite Television Community Protection and Promotion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282. |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-354. |
2019-11-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2019-11-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2019-11-19 | House | Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Commerce
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Television and film
Commerce
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Television and film