US HB5209 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy Communities through Helping to Offer Incentives and Choices to Everyone in Society Act of 2010 - Revises federal health law to address obesity, including through: (1) routine collection of data needed to calculate body mass index (BMI); (2) expansion of coverage for obesity under Medicare, Medicaid, and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP, formerly known as SCHIP); (3) programs to promote healthy eating behaviors and physical activity; and (4) training of health care professionals on how to treat and prevent obesity and aid individuals who are obese or overweight. Amends the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to expand the nutritional requirements of food offered through child and adult food programs. Includes a physical activity component for children's food programs. Sets forth provisions to expand physical activity through: (1) programs to connect children and families with the outdoors; (2) guidelines for physical education in elementary and secondary schools; (3) inclusion of physical education as a core academic subject in schools; (4) tax incentives for employer provided membership to athletic or fitness facilities; and (5) enrichment programs, such as summer camps, for children on Indian reservations and tribal lands. Sets forth provisions to improve knowledge of and access to healthy foods through: (1) educating consumers about physical activity and lifestyles; (2) infrastructure improvements to food programs; (3) expansion of retail food stores offering affordable, nutritious foods in underserved communities; and (4) expansion of urban community gardens. Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to make grants to assist local planning decisions and policies that increase the access of individuals to physical activity. Expands the program to provide safe routes to schools to include high school students. Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), acting through the National Center for Health Statistics, to provide for the: (1) collection of data for determining the fitness levels and energy expenditures of children and youth; and (2) analysis of data collected as part of the National Health and Nutrition Examination Survey and other data sources.
Title
Healthy Communities through Helping to Offer Incentives and Choices to Everyone in Society Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Mary Bono Mack [R-CA] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities. | |
2010-05-07 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Agriculture | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Child care and development
Child health
Consumer affairs
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
General taxation matters
Government information and archives
Government investigations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Nutrition and diet
Outdoor recreation
Pedestrians and bicycling
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Poverty and welfare assistance
Preschool education
Retail and wholesale trades
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Transportation programs funding
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Child care and development
Child health
Consumer affairs
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Food assistance and relief
Food industry and services
General taxation matters
Government information and archives
Government investigations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Nutrition and diet
Outdoor recreation
Pedestrians and bicycling
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Poverty and welfare assistance
Preschool education
Retail and wholesale trades
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/5209/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr5209/BILLS-111hr5209ih.pdf |