US HB5278 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend the period under which an election must be made for entitlement to educational assistance under the All-Volunteer Educational Assistance Program of Department of Veterans Affairs, to phase out the use of such program, and for other purposes.
Title
GI Bill Planning Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3608 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4162 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2136 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2830 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4162 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2136 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2830 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Government information and archives
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5278/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5278/BILLS-116hr5278ih.pdf |