US HB5330 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 10, United States Code, to establish a Department of Defense Military Housing Readiness Council, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 10, United States Code, to establish a Department of Defense Military Housing Readiness Council, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2023-09-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2047 (Related) 2023-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB2047 (Related) 2023-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5330/BILLS-118hr5330ih.pdf |