US HB5406 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-882, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-882, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTTH Act Helping Ensure Accountability, Leadership, and Trust in Tribal Healthcare Act
Title
HEALTTH Act Helping Ensure Accountability, Leadership, and Trust in Tribal Healthcare Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-882, Part I. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax exclusion
Indian social and development programs
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Medicare
Minority health
Native Americans
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Transportation costs
Department of Health and Human Services
Employee performance
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax exclusion
Indian social and development programs
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Medicare
Minority health
Native Americans
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5406/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5406/BILLS-114hr5406ih.pdf |