US HB5483 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Special Registration for Telemedicine Clarification Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to establish a deadline for the Drug Enforcement Administration to promulgate regulations for the special registration of practitioners to practice telemedicine.
Title
Special Registration for Telemedicine Clarification Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5060) |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5483. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5060-5061) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations