US HB5544 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4279-4280)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4279-4280)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terrorist Screening Database Improvement Act
Title
Terrorist Screening Database Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4279-4280) |
2016-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2016-06-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4057-4058) |
2016-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5544/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5544/BILLS-114hr5544ih.pdf |