US HB5612 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-299.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-299.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2886 Sandy Plains Road in Marietta, Georgia, as the "Marine Lance Corporal Squire 'Skip' Wells Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2886 Sandy Plains Road in Marietta, Georgia, as the "Marine Lance Corporal Squire 'Skip' Wells Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2886 Sandy Plains Road in Marietta, Georgia, as the "Marine Lance Corporal Squire 'Skip' Wells Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-299. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7132) |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5671) |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5612. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5671-5672) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition