US HB580 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to instruct the Department of the Interior or the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to provide advance written notification to each owner of land that is adjacent to a parcel acquired to become public lands or National Forest System (NFS) lands. Interior or USDA must provide advance written notification to each owner of land that is adjacent to a parcel of public lands or NFS lands to be conveyed by sale, exchange, or other disposal method. The Bureau of Land Management, before commencing a resurvey of federal land under its administrative jurisdiction, must notify all property owners who have land abutting or adjacent to the land being resurveyed.
Title
Protection and Transparency for Adjacent Landowners Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5077 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
General public lands matters
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
General public lands matters
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/580/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr580/BILLS-116hr580ih.pdf |