US HB586 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Denali National Park Improvement Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to issue permits for specified microhydro projects in the Kantishna Hills area within the Denali National Park and Preserve (the Park) in Alaska. Defines "microhydro project" as a hydroelectric power generating facility with a maximum power generation capability of 100 kilowatts and includes any distribution or transmission lines required to serve such area. Requires the Secretary, within 180 days after submission of a permit application, to complete any analysis required by the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 respecting any proposed or existing microhydro projects in the area. Directs the Secretary to exchange Park land near or adjacent to land owned by Doyon Tourism, Inc., located at the mouth of Eureka Creek for approximately 18 acres of land owned by Doyon Tourism within the Galena patented mining claim. Instructs the Secretary to seek to complete such exchange by February 2015. Permits an equalization of any unequal values of the tracts proposed for exchange by adjusting the quantity of the acreage owned by Doyon Tourism. Requires the land acquired by the Secretary to be administered as part of the Park. Authorizes the Secretary to issue right-of-way permits, subject to certain terms and conditions, for: (1) a high-pressure natural gas transmission pipeline (including appurtenances) in nonwilderness areas within the boundary of the Park within, along, or near the approximately seven-mile segment of the George Parks Highway that runs through the Park; and (2) any distribution and transmission pipelines and appurtenances that the Secretary determines to be necessary to provide natural gas supply to the Park. Designates the Talkeetna Ranger Station that is on B Street in Talkeetna, Alaska, and that is approximately 100 miles south of the entrance to the Park, as the Walter Harper Talkeetna Ranger Station.
Title
Denali National Park Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157. |
2013-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-217. |
2013-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-05-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB157 (Same As) 2013-09-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-33.
Subjects
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pipelines
Public lands and natural resources
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pipelines
Public lands and natural resources