US HB5972 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-306.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-306.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1, in Wilmington, Delaware, as the "Mary Ann Shadd Cary Post Office."
Title
Mary Ann Shadd Cary Post Office Dedication Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-306. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7643-7644) |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7135) |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7135) |
2020-12-10 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-12-10 | House | Ms. Kelly (IL) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Delaware
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Delaware
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service