US HB615 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164.
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 4:00 pm in H-313, CAPITOL
Hearing: Jun 1 @ 1:00 am in H-313, CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164.
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 4:00 pm in H-313, CAPITOL
Hearing: Jun 1 @ 1:00 am in H-313, CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture from prohibiting the use of lead ammunition or tackle on certain Federal land or water under the jurisdiction of the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Access for Hunters and Anglers Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164. |
2023-09-20 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2023-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-203, Part I. |
2023-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-06-21 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-05-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1185 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.