US HB6228 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To allow for transfer of ownership of certain Federal parcels in Nevada, to allow for disposal of Federal lands in Nevada for economic development, to make technical corrections to existing law, for conservation, and for other purposes.
Title
Northern Nevada Economic Development and Conservation Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2020-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2804 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB2890 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB3465 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6889 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB2890 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB3465 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6889 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Birds
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Economic development
Education programs funding
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historical and cultural resources
Hunting and fishing
Hydrology and hydrography
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Nevada
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pest management
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Birds
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Economic development
Education programs funding
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historical and cultural resources
Hunting and fishing
Hydrology and hydrography
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Nevada
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pest management
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6228/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6228/BILLS-116hr6228ih.pdf |