US HB6414 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 Correctional Facility Emergency Response Act of 2020 This bill establishes a new grant program to help states and local governments prevent, detect, and stop the spread of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) in correctional facilities. Specifically, the Department of Justice (DOJ) must award grants to states and local governments that release certain persons—persons who do not pose a serious risk or who meet certain criteria based on age or health—from correctional facilities. Additionally, DOJ must award grants to states and local governments that adopt cite-and-release procedures for suspects who do not pose a public safety risk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Correctional Facility Emergency Response Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2020-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3720 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback