US HB6682 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waives matching funds requirements for entities that receive grants from the Department of Agriculture through the Farmers Market and Local Food Promotion Program or the Value-Added Producer Grant program. The matching funds requirements shall not apply with respect to grants awarded during the period beginning on January 1, 2019, and ending on December 31, 2021.
Title
To provide for a waiver of the matching funds requirement for the farmers market and local food promotion program and value added producer grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2020-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Retail and wholesale trades
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6682/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6682/BILLS-116hr6682ih.pdf |