US HB688 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 70.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 70.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill adjusts the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest in Colorado to incorporate approximately 92.95 acres of land. The Department of Agriculture shall include all federal land within the boundary in the Bowen Gulch Protection Area established under the Colorado Wilderness Act of 1993.
Title
Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 70. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-57. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H983) |
2017-02-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 688. |
2017-02-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H983-984) |
2017-02-06 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB289 (Same As) 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 67.
SB2337 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2337 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.