US HB6931 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Dam Safety Program Act to improve that Act, and for other purposes.
Title
NDSP Amendment Act National Dam Safety Program Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5104 (Related) 2023-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB3111 (Related) 2023-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3111 (Related) 2023-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6931/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6931/BILLS-118hr6931ih.pdf |