US HB705 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive 1099 Taxpayer Protection and Repayment of Exchange Subsidy Overpayments Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) repeal requirements for the reporting to the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) of payments of $600 or more to corporations that are not tax-exempt and of gross proceeds paid in consideration for any type of property, (2) repeal requirements for reporting payments made with respect to rental property which is not part of a trade or business, and (3) increase the limitation on recapture of excess advance payments of the tax credit for health insurance premiums.
Title
Comprehensive 1099 Taxpayer Protection and Repayment of Exchange Subsidy Overpayments Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Camp [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 7. |
2011-02-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 112-16. |
2011-02-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15. |
2011-02-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB359 (Same As) 2011-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR129 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-9.
HR129 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-9.
Subjects
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Corporate finance and management
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation