US HB706 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restoring the Public Trust Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restoring the Public Trust Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB273 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB329 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB538 (Related) 2019-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB1524 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB1847 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback