US HB7163 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to reduce the backlog of Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) requests by 75% within three years of enactment of the bill. Additionally, the VA must reduce the backlog of Office of Special Counsel requests made to the VA by 75% within three years of the enactment of this bill. The VA must determine the types of documents, records, and information that are frequently requested under FOIA and must regularly make such documents, records, and information publicly available. Finally, the VA must request that the Office of Government Information Services within the National Archives and Records Administration conduct an assessment of the VA's compliance with FOIA.
Title
VA FOIA Reform Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Freedom of information
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
National Archives and Records Administration
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Freedom of information
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
National Archives and Records Administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7163/BILLS-116hr7163ih.pdf |