US HB7370 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to establish a deadline for processing applications related to geothermal leasing.
Title
Geothermal Energy Opportunity Act GEO Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-04-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7370/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7370/BILLS-118hr7370ih.pdf |