US HB7489 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the National Park Service (NPS) to convey to Virginia or the District of Columbia any federal land or interest in federal land under the jurisdiction of the NPS that is identified by Virginia or the District as necessary for the Long Bridge Project, a project to expand commuter and regional passenger rail service and provide bicycle and pedestrian access crossings over the Potomac River. The NPS may allow the temporary use of any federal land under the jurisdiction of the NPS that is identified by Virginia or the District as necessary for the construction of the Long Bridge Project.
Title
Long Bridge Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7125) |
2020-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7489. |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7125-7126) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-12-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 505. |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-613. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-29 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-07-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
District of Columbia
Infrastructure development
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
Virginia
Infrastructure development
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
Virginia