US HB7777 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase, effective as of December 1, 2024, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans’ Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1529 (Related) 2023-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
SB777 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Became Public Law No: 118-6.
SB4047 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB777 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Became Public Law No: 118-6.
SB4047 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7777/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7777/BILLS-118hr7777ih.pdf |