US SB4047 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to increase, effective as of December 1, 2024, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans' COLA Act of 2024 Veterans’ Compensation Cost-Of-Living Adjustment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1529 (Related) 2023-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB7777 (Related) 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
SB777 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Became Public Law No: 118-6.
HB7777 (Related) 2024-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
SB777 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Became Public Law No: 118-6.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/4047/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s4047/BILLS-118s4047is.pdf |