US HB7929 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes in the legislative branch the Pandemic Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Commission to make recommendations and propose legislation for modification, consolidation, harmonization, or repeal of regulations that may impede the response to, and recovery from, the effects of the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic and future pandemics. The commission must give priority to regulations that (1) were suspended or waived during the COVID-19 pandemic; (2) may impede preparedness or response to a future pandemic; (3) impede or may impede public health, economic performance, or wage and employment stability; and (4) impede or may impede individuals' access to health care, employment, or other supports. The bill sets forth reporting requirements for the commission and procedures for congressional consideration of commission reports, recommendations, and proposed legislation.
Title
Pandemic Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8038 (Related) 2020-08-14 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3269 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4708 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3269 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4708 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Competition and antitrust
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Government operations and politics
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Legislative rules and procedure
Public participation and lobbying
Small business
Wages and earnings
Advisory bodies
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Competition and antitrust
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Government operations and politics
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Legislative rules and procedure
Public participation and lobbying
Small business
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7929/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7929/BILLS-116hr7929ih.pdf |