US HB8134 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the screening procedures for consumer products moving through ports of entry. First, the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) must consult with the U.S. Customs and Border Protection to target consumer products in violation of product safety rules, including (1) shipments that are valued below the threshold for the application of duties, (2) shipments from China, and (3) products that may both violate product safety rules and infringe intellectual property rights. The CPSC also must develop information technology systems that support connections to other specified customs control systems.Further, beginning not later than two years after the date of enactment, the bill requires manufacturers to electronically file certificates of compliance with applicable product safety rules for products intended for entry into the United States.Finally, the CPSC must hire, train, and assign specified full-time personnel to support the identification and assessment of products in violation of product safety rules at ports of entry.
Title
Consumer Product Safety Inspection Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4983-4984) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8134. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4983-4988) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437. |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-537. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-08-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
China
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Customs enforcement
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Intellectual property
Product safety and quality
Trade restrictions
China
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Customs enforcement
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Intellectual property
Product safety and quality
Trade restrictions