US HB8326 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires grant applicants for certain public works and economic development projects to describe in their comprehensive economic development strategy how they will increase the accessibility of affordable, quality child care.
Title
CED Act Child Care is Economic Development Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5851) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8326. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5851-5853) |
2020-11-17 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 476. |
2020-11-16 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-578, Part I. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7683 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB4383 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4383 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child care and development
Department of Commerce
Economic development
Families
Child care and development
Department of Commerce
Economic development
Families