US HB8454 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a National Commission on Online Child Sexual Exploitation Prevention, and for other purposes.
Title
EARN IT Act of 2020 Eliminating Abusive and Rampant Neglect of Interactive Technologies Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5376 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3007 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3398 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491.
SB3007 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3398 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Pornography
Sex offenses
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Pornography
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8454/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8454/BILLS-116hr8454ih.pdf |